Android app on Google Play

Long multiplication

It is very simple to make a long division by hand, if you know the method.

We recommend, however, that you practice the multiplication tables first.

The best way to explain, how a long multiplication is carried out, is by an example.

Example of the multiplication of 24 and 341

24*341
      
     0
      
First the multiplication problem is set up like this. Since 24 is a number of two digits, the second row starts with zerro. Had the number 24 been another number consisting of three digits instead, there would have been a third row in the setup starting with two zeroes. Had it been a number consisting of four digits, there would have been a fourth row in the setup starting with three zeroes and so forth.


24*341
     4
     0
      
We calculate 4 × 1 = 4, and write 4 on the first place in the first row.


   1  
24*341
    64
     0
      
We calculate 4 × 4 = 16 and write 6 on the second place in the upper row and carry the 1 over the 3.


  1  
24*341
   1364
     0
      
We calculate 4 × 3 + 1 =13 (because 1 is carried over the 3). We write 3 on the third place and 1 on the fourth place in the upper row, because there are no more digits left to carry the 1 over to.




24*341
  1364
    20
      
We calculate 2 × 1 = 2. We write 2 on the second place in the lower row.


24*341
  1364
   820
      
We calculate 2 × 4 = 8. We write 8 on the third place in the lower row.


24*341
  1364
  6820
      
We calculate 2 × 3 = 6. We write 6 on the third place in the lower row.


24*341
  1364
  6820
  8184
Finaly we add the two numbers together.


The result is 8184.

Long Multiplication

Number 1: 
Number 2: